Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Development Fees and Taxes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 /CH0567
Title
Prince George's County - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharges - Behavioral Health Programs PG 414-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 /CH0567 Prince George's County - Public Safety and Behavioral Health Surcharges - Behavioral Health Programs PG 414-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page