Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Developmental Disabilities -see also- Vulnerable Adults

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177
Title
9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 /CH0736 (SB0868/CH0737)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0737 (HB1020/CH0736)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration – Self–Directed Services (Self–Direction Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0177 9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1020 /CH0736 (SB0868/CH0737) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act of 2022) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB1121 Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0868 /CH0737 (HB1020/CH0736) Developmental Disabilities Administration – Self–Directed Services (Self–Direction Act of 2022) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page