Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Developmental Disabilities -see also- Vulnerable Adults

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0441)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0318)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481)
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 (SB0441) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0392 Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0850 Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 /CH0481 (SB0520/CH0482) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1258 Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0441 (HB0318) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0482 (HB1243/CH0481) Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:05 PM
Click to return on the top page