Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 /CH0115 (SB0228/CH0116)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0904 (SB0600/CH0903)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0779
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Public Schools - Student Health - Information on Accessible Dental Health
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 (SB0334)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Dent-Care Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499 /CH0905 (SB0335)
Title
Health Occupations - Private Dental Offices - Infection Control
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Adult and Pediatric Dental Services - Reimbursement Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0901 (SB0799/CH0902)
Title
Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0116 (HB0023/CH0115)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 (HB0393)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Dent-Care Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0499/CH0905)
Title
Health Occupations - Private Dental Offices - Infection Control
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0903 (HB0103/CH0904)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 /CH0902 (HB0786/CH0901)
Title
Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 /CH0115 (SB0228/CH0116) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0103 /CH0904 (SB0600/CH0903) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 904
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0149 /CH0779 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0167 Public Schools - Student Health - Information on Accessible Dental Health Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0393 (SB0334) Higher Education - Maryland Dent-Care Program - Eligibility Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0499 /CH0905 (SB0335) Health Occupations - Private Dental Offices - Infection Control Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 905
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0767 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Adult and Pediatric Dental Services - Reimbursement Rates Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0901 (SB0799/CH0902) Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 901
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0228 /CH0116 (HB0023/CH0115) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 (HB0393) Higher Education - Maryland Dent-Care Program - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0499/CH0905) Health Occupations - Private Dental Offices - Infection Control Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0600 /CH0903 (HB0103/CH0904) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services - Coverage and Rate Study Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 903
Finance
2/16/2024 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0799 /CH0902 (HB0786/CH0901) Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 902
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page