Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 /CH0302 (SB0150/CH0303)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0159)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 /CH0707 (SB0440/CH0708)
Title
Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 /CH0364 (SB0714)
Title
Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0309 (SB0611/CH0310)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266
Title
Dentists - Saliva Lead Poisoning Screening Tests - Scope of Practice and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0303 (HB0006/CH0302)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0462)
Title
Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 /CH0310 (HB0969/CH0309)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB0968/CH0364)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Assistants - Certification and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 /CH0302 (SB0150/CH0303) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0462 (SB0159) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0625 /CH0707 (SB0440/CH0708) Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0968 /CH0364 (SB0714) Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0969 /CH0309 (SB0611/CH0310) State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1266 Dentists - Saliva Lead Poisoning Screening Tests - Scope of Practice and Requirements Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0150 /CH0303 (HB0006/CH0302) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Finance
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0159 (HB0462) Health Occupations - Authorized Prescribers - Financial Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0611 /CH0310 (HB0969/CH0309) State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0714 (HB0968/CH0364) Health Occupations - Dental Assistants - Certification and Regulation Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page