Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Delivery Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0833)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Sale or Delivery for Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0642)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 /CH0774 (SB0456/CH0775)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Packages (Porch Piracy Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215
Title
Transportation Financing - Retail Delivery Fee and Transportation Network Company Impact Fee (Transportation Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047
Title
Public Health - Sale of Diet Pills to Minors - Prohibition (Protecting Teenagers From Unregulated Diet Pills)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 /CH0578
Title
State Procurement - Preferred Provider Requirements - Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 /CH0775 (HB0808/CH0774)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0735)
Title
Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0637)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971
Title
Howard County - Class D Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Delivery
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0637 (SB0833) Alcoholic Beverages – Sale or Delivery for Off–Premises Consumption Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0642) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0808 /CH0774 (SB0456/CH0775) Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0946 Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Packages (Porch Piracy Act of 2024) Delegate Toles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 Transportation Financing - Retail Delivery Fee and Transportation Network Company Impact Fee (Transportation Funding Act of 2024) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1217 (SB1041/CH0918) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0047 Public Health - Sale of Diet Pills to Minors - Prohibition (Protecting Teenagers From Unregulated Diet Pills) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0194 /CH0578 State Procurement - Preferred Provider Requirements - Waiver Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0456 /CH0775 (HB0808/CH0774) Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit Senator Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0642 (HB0735) Maryland Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Program Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0637) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0971 Howard County - Class D Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Delivery Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB1041 /CH0918 (HB1217) Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 918
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page