Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Delivery Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0513)
Title
Cancer Drugs – Physician Dispensing and Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0763)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0541 (SB0731/CH0542)
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0662
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0791)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0170)
Title
Cancer Drugs - Physician Dispensing and Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 /CH0542 (HB1059/CH0541)
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties – Alcoholic Beverages – Gift Basket Permits
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0996)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1241)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0170 (SB0513) Cancer Drugs – Physician Dispensing and Coverage Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0994 Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0996 (SB0763) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1059 /CH0541 (SB0731/CH0542) Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1155 /CH0662 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1241 (SB0791) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0513 (HB0170) Cancer Drugs - Physician Dispensing and Coverage Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0731 /CH0542 (HB1059/CH0541) Allegany and Garrett Counties – Alcoholic Beverages – Gift Basket Permits Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0763 (HB0996) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1241) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page