Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Defendants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0315)
Title
Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0161)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Attorney General - Wrongful Convictions - Investigations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0021)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0265)
Title
Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 (HB0079)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0559)
Title
Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0070)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520)
Title
Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0833)
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB0315) Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0079 (SB0161) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0249 Attorney General - Wrongful Convictions - Investigations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 (SB0021) Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521) Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0559 (SB0265) Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until next session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0822 Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Dismissal of Charges Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0021 (HB0337) Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 (HB0079) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 (HB0559) Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0070) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520) Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB0833) Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0897 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page