Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Defendants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234 (SB0607)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0187)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0625)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0162)
Title
Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0023)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 (SB0524)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0316)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 (HB1331)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB0308)
Title
Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0240)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0739)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590
Title
Criminal Procedure - Required Disclosures - Brady Material
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0234)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0260)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0234 (SB0607) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0238 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0240 (SB0187) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0260 (SB0625) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0308 (SB0162) Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0316 (SB0023) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0739 (SB0524) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0744 Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 (HB0316) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0124 (HB1331) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0162 (HB0308) Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 (HB0240) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0222 Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0524 (HB0739) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0590 Criminal Procedure - Required Disclosures - Brady Material Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 (HB0234) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0625 (HB0260) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page