Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0618
Title
Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0498)
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 /CH0663
Title
Tax Sales - Alternative Collection Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB0699)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0132)
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB1437)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB0993/CH0466)
Title
Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0618 Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions Delegate Lopez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Economic Matters
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0132 (SB0498) Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022) Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1196 /CH0663 Tax Sales - Alternative Collection Programs Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1242 (SB0826/CH0384) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
HB1437 (SB0699) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0152 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0132) Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0699 (HB1437) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 /CH0384 (HB1242) Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
SB0919 (HB0993/CH0466) Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page