Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0771
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Earned Wage Access and Credit Modernization
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661
Title
Consumer Protection and Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Requirements on Judgment Creditors
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0630)
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689
Title
Electric Vehicles – Repeal of Excise Tax Credit and Establishment of Rebate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Institutional Debt - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108 (SB1167)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Nonpublic Schools – Transcripts – Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262
Title
Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB0673)
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1167 (HB1108)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 /CH0771 Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0246 Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Earned Wage Access and Credit Modernization Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0661 Consumer Protection and Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Requirements on Judgment Creditors Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 (SB0630) Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt Delegate Embry 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0689 Electric Vehicles – Repeal of Excise Tax Credit and Establishment of Rebate Program Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-11)
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0708 Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Institutional Debt - Report Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1108 (SB1167) Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1164 Nonpublic Schools – Transcripts – Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB0673) Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-20)
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1167 (HB1108) Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page