Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Central Collection Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB0255)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions from Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0910)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0249
Title
State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB0657)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1312)
Title
COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0364 State Finance and Procurement - Central Collection Unit - Powers Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0585 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0657 (SB0255) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0772 Courts - Judgments - Exemptions from Execution Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1308 Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Traffic Citations - Enforcement Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1312 (SB0910) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
SB0206 /CH0249 State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0255 (HB0657) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0910 (HB1312) COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page