Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0396)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0055
Title
Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0019 (HB0425/CH0018)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0423)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 /CH0142
Title
Crimes - Firearms and Inmates - Enforcement, Procedures, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0423 (SB0396) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019) Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1021 /CH0055 Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 /CH0019 (HB0425/CH0018) Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0423) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0773 Income Tax - Credit for Firearm Safety Devices Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0861 /CH0142 Crimes - Firearms and Inmates - Enforcement, Procedures, and Reporting Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 12:05 PM
Click to return on the top page