Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0098)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0201 (SB0455/CH0202)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0092
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0285)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944 /CH0437 (SB0711/CH0438)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB0768)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323
Title
Algorithmic Decision Systems – Procurement and Discriminatory Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0155)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0422)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0202 (HB0290/CH0201)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504
Title
Discrimination in Employment – Use of Medical Cannabis – Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 /CH0438 (HB0944/CH0437)
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB1088)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911
Title
Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0155 (SB0098) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0290 /CH0201 (SB0455/CH0202) Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0297 /CH0092 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0422 (SB0285) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0944 /CH0437 (SB0711/CH0438) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Delegate Solomon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1088 (SB0768) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1216 Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1323 Algorithmic Decision Systems – Procurement and Discriminatory Acts Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0098 (HB0155) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0285 (HB0422) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0455 /CH0202 (HB0290/CH0201) Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0504 Discrimination in Employment – Use of Medical Cannabis – Prohibition Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 /CH0438 (HB0944/CH0437) Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0768 (HB1088) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 Harassment and Sexual Harassment – Definitions – Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0911 Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page