Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578 (SB0562)
Title
Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0979 (SB0658/CH0980)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0310 (SB1108/CH0311)
Title
Carroll County – Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff – Oath of Office
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 /CH0981 (SB0521/CH0982)
Title
Garrett County – Sheriff’s Salary – Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Hinebaugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 /CH0202 (SB1160)
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff - Staffing
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0988 (SB0965)
Title
Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170
Title
Garrett County - State's Attorney - Salary Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Hinebaugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0991 (SB0934)
Title
Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Baltimore City - Arrest Warrants for Violation of Probation - Time Frame
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 /CH0982 (HB0906/CH0981)
Title
Garrett County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0578)
Title
Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 /CH0980 (HB0668/CH0979)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 /CH0762
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Seventh Judicial Circuit
Sponsor
Senator Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1213/CH0991)
Title
Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1060/CH0988)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310)
Title
Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1160 (HB1034/CH0202)
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff - Staffing
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0578 (SB0562) Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0668 /CH0979 (SB0658/CH0980) Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Delegate Pruski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 979
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0310 (SB1108/CH0311) Carroll County – Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff – Oath of Office Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0906 /CH0981 (SB0521/CH0982) Garrett County – Sheriff’s Salary – Alteration Delegate Hinebaugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 981
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1034 /CH0202 (SB1160) Baltimore City Sheriff - Staffing Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 /CH0988 (SB0965) Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 988
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1170 Garrett County - State's Attorney - Salary Alterations Delegate Hinebaugh 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1213 /CH0991 (SB0934) Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 991
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0082 Baltimore City - Arrest Warrants for Violation of Probation - Time Frame Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
SB0521 /CH0982 (HB0906/CH0981) Garrett County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 982
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0578) Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup Frederick County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0658 /CH0980 (HB0668/CH0979) Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 980
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0687 /CH0762 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Seventh Judicial Circuit Senator Smith 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1213/CH0991) Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0965 (HB1060/CH0988) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310) Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1160 (HB1034/CH0202) Baltimore City Sheriff - Staffing Senator Carter 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page