Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614)
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0601 (SB0432/CH0602)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 /CH0277 (SB0906/CH0278)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0538
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613)
Title
Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746
Title
Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614) Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0585 /CH0601 (SB0432/CH0602) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0692 /CH0277 (SB0906/CH0278) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0873 Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 /CH0538 Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0432 /CH0602 (HB0585/CH0601) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613) Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0746 Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary Frederick County Senators 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Failed (57-65)
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0278 (HB0692/CH0277) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Restrictions on Practice Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/2/2022 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page