Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0181 (SB0007/CH0182)
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0504 (SB0613/CH0505)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0650
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332
Title
Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 /CH0182 (HB0186/CH0181)
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 /CH0505 (HB0794/CH0504)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 /CH0522
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0181 (SB0007/CH0182) Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0194 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0447 Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0794 /CH0504 (SB0613/CH0505) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1097 /CH0650 St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Personnel Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0007 /CH0182 (HB0186/CH0181) Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0613 /CH0505 (HB0794/CH0504) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0914 /CH0522 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page