Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048
Title
Courts - Justices and Judges - Selection and Retention
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 /CH0914 (SB0159/CH0913)
Title
Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0019/CH0347)
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
District Court - Traffic Cases - Surcharges
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 (SB0057)
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Roberson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0757 (SB0688/CH0756)
Title
Prince George's County - Judgeships - Circuit Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Public School Attendance - Children of Judges
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 (SB0827)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0873/CH0366)
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB1037)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Tomlinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0347 (HB0181)
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0392)
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 /CH0913 (HB0125/CH0914)
Title
Courts - Military Records - Recordation and Inspection
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 /CH0756 (HB0592/CH0757)
Title
Prince George's County - Judgeships - Circuit Courts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1079)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 /CH0366 (HB1323)
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1392)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 Courts - Justices and Judges - Selection and Retention Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Judiciary
Ways and Means
HB0125 /CH0914 (SB0159/CH0913) Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 914
Judiciary
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0181 (SB0019/CH0347) Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0259 District Court - Traffic Cases - Surcharges Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 (SB0057) Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0446 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Roberson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 /CH0757 (SB0688/CH0756) Prince George's County - Judgeships - Circuit Courts Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0930 Primary and Secondary Education - Public School Attendance - Children of Judges Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report Delegate Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 (SB0827) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1323 (SB0873/CH0366) Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB1037) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Delegate Tomlinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0347 (HB0181) Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0034 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0392) Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 /CH0913 (HB0125/CH0914) Courts - Military Records - Recordation and Inspection Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 913
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0688 /CH0756 (HB0592/CH0757) Prince George's County - Judgeships - Circuit Courts Senator Smith 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0827 (HB1079) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 /CH0366 (HB1323) Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0912 Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB1037 (HB1392) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page