Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Credit

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0485 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Youth Sports Programs - Registrations, Personnel, and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0565)
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 (SB0825)
Title
Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB0699)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451 /CH0380
Title
Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485)
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0800)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB1437)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1211)
Title
Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 /CH0485 (SB0554) Maryland New Start Act of 2022 Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Ways and Means
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0435 Youth Sports Programs - Registrations, Personnel, and Policy Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0565) Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
Finance
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 (SB0825) Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1437 (SB0699) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1451 /CH0380 Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0102 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485) Maryland New Start Act of 2022 Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0800) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 (HB1437) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB1211) Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page