Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Credit

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0217)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0552)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 /CH0638 (SB0392/CH0639)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB0255)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 /CH0783 (SB0691/CH0784)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0426
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 (HB0117)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB0657)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0168)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 /CH0190
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 /CH0784 (HB0861/CH0783)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0217) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0168 (SB0552) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0221 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0606 /CH0638 (SB0392/CH0639) Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Economic Matters
1/29/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0657 (SB0255) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0861 /CH0783 (SB0691/CH0784) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 783
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1213 /CH0426 Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0217 (HB0117) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0255 (HB0657) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0168) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 /CH0190 Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0691 /CH0784 (HB0861/CH0783) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page