Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 /CH0620 (SB0916/CH0621)
Title
Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 (SB0317)
Title
Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 (HB0725)
Title
Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 /CH0621 (HB0345/CH0620)
Title
Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0345 /CH0620 (SB0916/CH0621) Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0725 (SB0317) Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 (HB0725) Oysters, Striped Bass, and Crabs - Commercial Authorizations - Suspensions and Revocations Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 /CH0621 (HB0345/CH0620) Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations Senator Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page