Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Designations - State Astronomical Feature - Crab Nebula
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004/JR0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 /JR0001 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 /CH0442 (SB0324/CH0443) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0762 State Designations - State Astronomical Feature - Crab Nebula Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0004/JR0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0324 /CH0443 (HB0204/CH0442) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SJ0004 /JR0001 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2021 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page