Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0049
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Annual Budget - Conditions on Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0065
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1002 /CH0049 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0468 Baltimore County Board of Education - Annual Budget - Conditions on Expenditures Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0893 /CH0065 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page