Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 /CH0571 (SB0823/CH0572)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 /CH0374 (SB0750/CH0375)
Title
Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0751)
Title
Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0650
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374)
Title
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 /CH0571 (SB0823/CH0572) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1044 Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Delegate Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1072 /CH0374 (SB0750/CH0375) Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 374
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 (SB0751) Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1097 /CH0650 St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1226 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0750 /CH0375 (HB1072/CH0374) Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page