Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427)
Title
Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1427 (SB0557/CH0717) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0557 /CH0717 (HB1427) Baltimore County - West Baltimore County Redevelopment Authority Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page