Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0813)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0813 (SB0861) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0862 St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 (SB0612) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1173 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0861 (HB0813) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page