Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

County Administrators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 /CH0610 (SB0716/CH0611)
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer - Revisions PG 502-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0676)
Title
Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0187
Title
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work - Accommodations and Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1128)
Title
Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0611 (HB0391/CH0610)
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB1357)
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 /CH0610 (SB0716/CH0611) Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Delegate Hartman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0614 Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0624 Prince George's County - Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer - Revisions PG 502-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Delegate Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1128 (SB0676) Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1142 /CH0187 Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1322 Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work - Accommodations and Discipline Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1128) Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0716 /CH0611 (HB0391/CH0610) Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0945 (HB1357) Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page