Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cosmetologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists – Licensing – Eyelash Extensions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0998 (SB0531/CH0999)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0325 (SB1044/CH0324)
Title
Cosmetologists - Esthetic Services - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 /CH0326 (SB0629/CH0327)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Membership - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0397
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 /CH0999 (HB0362/CH0998)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0327 (HB1362/CH0326)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Membership - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 /CH0324 (HB1302/CH0325)
Title
Cosmetologists - Esthetic Services - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 State Board of Cosmetologists – Licensing – Eyelash Extensions Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0998 (SB0531/CH0999) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 998
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0633 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1302 /CH0325 (SB1044/CH0324) Cosmetologists - Esthetic Services - Definition Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1362 /CH0326 (SB0629/CH0327) State Board of Cosmetologists - Membership - Alteration Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0264 /CH0397 State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension and Report Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 /CH0999 (HB0362/CH0998) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Caroline County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 999
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0629 /CH0327 (HB1362/CH0326) State Board of Cosmetologists - Membership - Alteration Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1044 /CH0324 (HB1302/CH0325) Cosmetologists - Esthetic Services - Definition Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page