Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0052)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 (SB0397)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0194)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0643)
Title
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Correctional Services – Geriatric Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0800)
Title
Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB0078)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 (HB0102)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB0089)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0402)
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Parole and Probation - Definition of Absconding
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1337)
Title
Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 (SB0052) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0089 (SB0397) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0100 Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 (SB0194) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0402 (SB0643) Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0426 Correctional Services – Geriatric Parole Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1233 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1337 (SB0800) Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021 Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0052 (HB0078) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0194 (HB0102) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0397 (HB0089) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0643 (HB0402) Correctional Services - Division of Parole and Probation - Definition of Absconding Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0800 (HB1337) Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021 Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0868 Correctional Services - Inmate Release Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page