Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0664
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0065)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0145)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0117)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0197)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0664 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0065) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0197 (SB0145) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 (HB0117) Cooperative Housing Corporations and Condominium Associations – Evidence of Insurance Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0145 (HB0197) Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:19 PM
Click to return on the top page