Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0433
Title
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0273 (SB0561/CH0274)
Title
Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0524 (SB0686/CH0523)
Title
Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 /CH0274 (HB0648/CH0273)
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 /CH0523 (HB1023/CH0524)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 /CH0433 Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0648 /CH0273 (SB0561/CH0274) Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0825 Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 /CH0524 (SB0686/CH0523) Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 524
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0561 /CH0274 (HB0648/CH0273) Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0686 /CH0523 (HB1023/CH0524) Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:17 PM
Click to return on the top page