Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB1273)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1273 Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0622 (HB1273) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page