Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0337)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0838/CH0416)
Title
Transportation - Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service - County Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0737)
Title
Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Alteration of Rate Due to Inflation
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0144)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates – Consumer Price Index Adjustment – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499)
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 (HB1191)
Title
Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0416 (HB1019)
Title
Transportation – Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service – County Funding
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 (SB0337) Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 /CH0499 (SB0506/CH0498) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1009 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1019 (SB0838/CH0416) Transportation - Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service - County Funding Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1191 (SB0737) Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022 Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1405 Sales and Use Tax - Alteration of Rate Due to Inflation Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1485 Trustees of the Walters Art Gallery - Collective Bargaining Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 (HB0144) Motor Fuel Tax Rates – Consumer Price Index Adjustment – Repeal Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0506 /CH0498 (HB0725/CH0499) Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0737 (HB1191) Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 /CH0416 (HB1019) Transportation – Elderly and Handicapped Transportation Service – County Funding Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page