Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0284 (SB0692/CH0285)
Title
State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0645
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0295 (SB0318/CH0296)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 /CH0296 (HB1134/CH0295)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 /CH0285 (HB0860/CH0284)
Title
State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0704 Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0850 Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0284 (SB0692/CH0285) State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0991 /CH0645 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1134 /CH0295 (SB0318/CH0296) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Delegate Bridges 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0318 /CH0296 (HB1134/CH0295) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0692 /CH0285 (HB0860/CH0284) State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page