Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commuters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154 /CH0587 (SB0801/CH0588)
Title
Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0588 (HB1154/CH0587)
Title
Labor and Employment – Economic Stabilization Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1154 /CH0587 (SB0801/CH0588) Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations Delegate Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Economic Matters
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0801 /CH0588 (HB1154/CH0587) Labor and Employment – Economic Stabilization Act – Alterations Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page