Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commercial Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719 (SB0582)
Title
Commercial Tenants - Personal Liability Clauses - Enforceability
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0764/CH0584)
Title
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Commercial Leases - Grounds for Termination by Tenant
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability and Landlord Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Real Property – Commercial Lease Addendum – Liquidated Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327
Title
Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Proceedings - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 /CH0408
Title
Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0719)
Title
Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0584 (HB0877)
Title
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Washington
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0719 (SB0582) Commercial Tenants - Personal Liability Clauses - Enforceability Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0877 (SB0764/CH0584) Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces Delegate Valentino-Smith 6 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0942 Commercial Leases - Grounds for Termination by Tenant Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1102 Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability and Landlord Relief Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1273 Real Property – Commercial Lease Addendum – Liquidated Damages Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1327 Public Utilities - Transitional and Default Electric Service - Implementation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1346 Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Proceedings - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0135 /CH0408 Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0418 Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0582 (HB0719) Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0764 /CH0584 (HB0877) Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces Senator Washington 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page