Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards – Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0144)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451
Title
Real Property – Residential Rental Property Inspection – Remote Visual Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0832)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0110)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0109)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348
Title
State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1061)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Performance Standards - Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction Compliance Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0109 (SB0254) Public Safety – Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards – Adoption Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0110 (SB0144) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0451 Real Property – Residential Rental Property Inspection – Remote Visual Inspection Delegate Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB1061 (SB0832) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0144 (HB0110) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0254 (HB0109) Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 State Government – Information Technology – Cybersecurity Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0832 (HB1061) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0915 The Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Performance Standards - Clarifications Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 9:30 PM
Click to return on the top page