Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Code Counties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0751)
Title
Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0544)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB1194)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 (SB0751) Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1194 (SB0544) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0544 (HB1194) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page