Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0279)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0396)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 (SB0279) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0577 Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1110 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1167 Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB1263 Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0279 (HB0396) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page