Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0173)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0372 (SB0488/CH0373)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Anne Arundel County and Prince George’s County – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Property License Information
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0330
Title
Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 (HB1331)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0242)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 /CH0373 (HB0449/CH0372)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 (SB0173) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2021 - 2:30 PM
HB0433 Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0449 /CH0372 (SB0488/CH0373) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 Anne Arundel County and Prince George’s County – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Property License Information Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0744 /CH0330 Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1044 Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1066 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1090 Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1203 Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0124 (HB1331) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0173 (HB0242) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 /CH0373 (HB0449/CH0372) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page