Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Citations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 /CH0468
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230
Title
Automated Enforcement - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666
Title
Law Enforcement - Quotas
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0330)
Title
County Boards of Health and Baltimore City Health Department - Procedures and Appeals Process
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 (SB0784)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0417
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0761)
Title
County Boards of Health and Baltimore City Health Department – Procedures and Appeals Process
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1054)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 /CH0468 Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0230 Automated Enforcement - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0666 Law Enforcement - Quotas Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 (SB0330) County Boards of Health and Baltimore City Health Department - Procedures and Appeals Process Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1054 (SB0784) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0146 /CH0417 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0330 (HB0761) County Boards of Health and Baltimore City Health Department – Procedures and Appeals Process Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0784 (HB1054) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page