Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking and Vaping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0099)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 (SB0378/CH0187)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789
Title
Prince George's County - Cigarettes and Other Tobacco Products - Licensing Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 (HB0477)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0187 (HB0646)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0477 (SB0099) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 (SB0378/CH0187) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB0789 Prince George's County - Cigarettes and Other Tobacco Products - Licensing Conditions Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 (HB0477) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0378 /CH0187 (HB0646) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page