Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Chesapeake Bay Restoration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755
Title
Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0755 Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 7:48 PM
Click to return on the top page