Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Chesapeake Bay

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0410 (SB0455/CH0409)
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Recreational License Fees - Moratorium
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0366)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 /CH0412 (SB0876/CH0411)
Title
Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses (Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Lockbox Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0921)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0409 (HB0601/CH0410)
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0360
Title
State Health Plan - Chesapeake Bay Commission - Retirees
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030)
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 /CH0411 (HB1201/CH0412)
Title
Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902
Title
Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0601 /CH0410 (SB0455/CH0409) Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0875 Hunting and Fishing - Recreational License Fees - Moratorium Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 (SB0366) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Oysters – Tributary–Scale Sanctuaries Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 /CH0412 (SB0876/CH0411) Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1218 Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1228 /CH0030 (SB0830/CH0574) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1311 Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses (Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Lockbox Act of 2022) Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1470 State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2022) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0366 (HB0921) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0455 /CH0409 (HB0601/CH0410) Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License and Recreational Fishing - Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0801 /CH0360 State Health Plan - Chesapeake Bay Commission - Retirees Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0830 /CH0574 (HB1228/CH0030) Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 /CH0411 (HB1201/CH0412) Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0902 Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page