Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Chesapeake Bay

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0227)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 (SB0119)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755
Title
Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 (SB0701)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0925)
Title
Workgroup on Public Water Access
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004 (SJ0006)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 (HB0507)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 (HB0295)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB0878)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB1267)
Title
Workgroup on Public Water Access
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0004)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 (SB0227) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0507 (SB0119) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0755 Natural Resources - Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - No Cost Licenses and Stamps Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0843 Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0878 (SB0701) Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0991 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Tree Planting – Urban Trees Program and Commission for the Innovation and Advancement of Carbon Markets and Sustainable Tree Plantings Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1267 (SB0925) Workgroup on Public Water Access Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1362 Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0001 (SJ0004) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
Rules
HJ0004 (SJ0006) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0119 (HB0507) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0227 (HB0295) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0274 State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2021) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 (HB0878) Bay Restoration Fund - County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 (HB1267) Workgroup on Public Water Access Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2021 - 9:45 AM
SJ0006 (HJ0004) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:30 AM
Click to return on the top page