Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 /CH0947 (SB0894/CH0948)
Title
Baltimore City – Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191
Title
Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0968
Title
Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 /CH0948 (HB0732/CH0947)
Title
Baltimore City - Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0732 /CH0947 (SB0894/CH0948) Baltimore City – Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 947
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1135 Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024 Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1191 Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 /CH0968 Montgomery County – State’s Attorney’s Office Personnel – Application of County Personnel Laws and Collective Bargaining MC 12–24 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 968
Appropriations
3/12/2024 - 12:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0085 Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act) Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 862
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0894 /CH0948 (HB0732/CH0947) Baltimore City - Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 948
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page