Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Census -see also- Data; Demographics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625
Title
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0619)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 /CH0702 (SB0859/CH0703)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0827)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0703 (HB1239/CH0702)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0625 Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol Density Zones and Licenses PG 307–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 (SB0619) No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Delegate Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1207 /CH0634 (SB0674/CH0635) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Delegate Bridges 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1239 /CH0702 (SB0859/CH0703) Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0619 (HB0827) No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0674 /CH0635 (HB1207/CH0634) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0859 /CH0703 (HB1239/CH0702) Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page