Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0241 (SB0192/CH0242)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373 (SB0960)
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 /CH0242 (HB0005/CH0241)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1373)
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0241 (SB0192/CH0242) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1099 Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1373 (SB0960) Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338) Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0192 /CH0242 (HB0005/CH0241) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0663 Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 (HB1373) Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page