Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 /CH0413 (SB0900/CH0414)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 /CH0414 (HB0644/CH0413)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0644 /CH0413 (SB0900/CH0414) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0900 /CH0414 (HB0644/CH0413) Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page