Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Casinos -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0297)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491)
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports Wagering Licensees
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 (HB0339)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257)
Title
Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0339 (SB0297) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491) Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0490 Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports Wagering Licensees Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Delegate Rogers 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0297 (HB0339) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257) Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page